Brown v. Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Dewayne Brown
Defendant: Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, William James Mitchell, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Joseph Patrick Carpenter, Professional Transportation Inc, Central of Georgia Railway Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co and Dairold Ken Warren
Case Number: 2:2019cv00463
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 48 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Riley, Richard)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Defendant Professional Transportation, Inc.'s Motion to Attend Rule 26(f) Conference By Telephone. #46 . For good cause shown, the Motion #46 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/8/2019. (KAM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION Permission to Attend Rule 26(f) Conference By Telephone by Professional Transportation Inc. (McCarthy, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dairold Ken Warren.(Hazelton, Jeremy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of the deadline to conduct their planning meeting; The deadline for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference is EXTENDED to August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/37/2019. (KAM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Second) to Hold Planning Meeting by Darryl Dewayne Brown. (Riley, Richard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dairold Ken Warren served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (MRR, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to answer the complaint and obtain an attorney; Defendant Carpenter has until 8/2/2019 to respond to the complaint and move the court to set aside its entry of default. If Defendant Carpenter wishes to retain an attorney, he should do so well in advance of August 2, 2019. Otherwise, he will be required to proceed pro se (representing himself) in this matter. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/7/2019. (KAM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to obtain a lawyer by Joseph Patrick Carpenter. (KAM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Serve Last Defendant #38 . The motion #38 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted an additional 45 days to serve Defendant Dairold Ken Warren. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/5/2019. (KAM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Last Defendant by Darryl Dewayne Brown. (Riley, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 37 Alias Summons Issued as to Dairold Ken Warren, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Dairold Ken Warren. (MRR, )
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Planning Meeting #34 . The motion #34 is GRANTED. The deadline for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) planning meeting is July 11, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/21/2019. (KAM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Planning Meeting (Unopposed) by Darryl Dewayne Brown. (Riley, Richard)
May 15, 2019 Filing 33 Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim by Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc.(Hazelton, Jeremy)
May 7, 2019 Filing 32 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Joseph Patrick Carpenter. (KAM)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/6/2019. (KAM)
May 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-463-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent. In light of Carpenter's continued failure to respond to the complaint, it appears unanimous consent in the timely manner contemplated in the General Order will not be possible. Accordingly, this matter is now due to be assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to REASSIGN this case to a district judge randomly drawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/3/2019. (KEK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc.(Hazelton, Jeremy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 27 Alias Summons Issued as to Dairold Ken Warren, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to re #24 Plaintiff's Application for Default Against Defendant Joseph Patrick Carpenter filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co. (Hess, Mark)
May 2, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to re #19 the Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Darryl Dewayne Brown. (Riley, Richard)
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Joseph Patrick Carpenter Motion is RIPE 5/2/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Darryl Dewayne Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard Riley)(Riley, Richard)
April 24, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Professional Transportation Inc. filed by Professional Transportation Inc (McCarthy, Brian)
April 24, 2019 Filing 22 Professional Transportation, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc, Dairold Ken Warren by Professional Transportation Inc.(McCarthy, Brian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by William James Mitchell.(Cobb, Amanda)
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve A Tucker on behalf of Central of Georgia Railway Company, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Tucker, Steve)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The pltf is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, within ten (10) calendar days, why the claims against Joseph Patrick Carpenter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/22/19. (MRR, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The unopposed motion seeking an extension of time to answer filed by defendant Professional Transportation, Inc., is GRANTED. (Doc. #17 ). Professional Transportation, Inc., SHALL file an answer by April 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/22/19. (MRR, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 4/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Professional Transportation Inc. (McCarthy, Brian)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central of Georgia Railway Company. filed by Central of Georgia Railway Company (Tucker, Steve) Modified-Amended version of Doc 15 on 4/15/2019 (MRR, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central of Georgia Railway Company. filed by Central of Georgia Railway Company (Tucker, Steve)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Tucker, Steve)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation. filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation (Tucker, Steve)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 Central of Georgia Railroad Company's, Norfolk Southern Railway Company's, and Norfolk Southern Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc, Dairold Ken Warren by Central of Georgia Railway Company, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Graham, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc.(Hazelton, Jeremy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co (Second copy, pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)) (Hess, Mark)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co (Hess, Mark)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co.(Hess, Mark)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Dairold Ken Warren. (MRR, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darryl Dewayne Brown. Professional Transportation Inc served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (KEK)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (MRR, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joseph Patrick Carpenter served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019; Central of Georgia Railway Company served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019; Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019; Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019; Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (MRR, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
March 19, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3303926 (B4601096193). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darryl Dewayne Brown.(MRR, ). (Riley, Richard) Modified on 3/20/2019 (MRR, ).
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
March 19, 2019 Request for service by certified mail filed within the body of the complaint by Darryl Dewayne Brown. (MRR, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darryl Dewayne Brown.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Dewayne Brown
Represented By: John David Marsh
Represented By: David T Brown
Represented By: Richard J Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylacauga Deluxe Cab Company Inc
Represented By: Jeremy S Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Steve A Tucker
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William James Mitchell
Represented By: Amanda R. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Steve A Tucker
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Patrick Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Transportation Inc
Represented By: Jonathan M Lieb
Represented By: Brian P McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central of Georgia Railway Company
Represented By: Steve A Tucker
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co
Represented By: Mark D Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dairold Ken Warren
Represented By: Jeremy S Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?