Carter v. CSX Transportation Inc et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Carter
Defendant: John Layne, Nicholas Barclay, CSX Transportation Inc and George Longcoy
Case Number: 2:2019cv00464
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/2/2019. (PSM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Hipaa Order Proposed by the Parties (Attached) by Matthew Carter. (Riley, Richard)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2020. Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/31/2019. (PSM)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Riley, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Carter. John Layne waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Riley, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Carter. George Longcoy waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Riley, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted (certified mail) - RETURN TO SENDER; ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD; as to John Layne. (KWC)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/15/2019. (PSM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation Inc. filed by CSX Transportation Inc (Richardson, Morris)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nicholas Barclay.(Richardson, Morris)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CSX Transportation Inc.(Richardson, Morris)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Carter. CSX Transportation Inc served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (TLM, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Carter. Nicholas Barclay served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (KAM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nicholas Barclay, CSX Transportation Inc, Matthew Carter, John Layne, George Longcoy. mailed certified mail (TLM, )
March 19, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601096194. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Nicholas Barclay, CSX Transportation Inc, John Layne, George Longcoy, filed by Matthew Carter.(PSM). (Riley, Richard) Modified on 3/20/2019 (TLM, ).
March 19, 2019 Request for service by certified mail filed by Matthew Carter, as stated in complaint #1 . (PSM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicholas Barclay, CSX Transportation Inc, John Layne, George Longcoy, filed by Matthew Carter.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. CSX Transportation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Barclay
Represented By: Morris Wade Richardson
Represented By: David E Malick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc
Represented By: Morris Wade Richardson
Represented By: David E Malick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Longcoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Carter
Represented By: Richard J Riley
Represented By: Roger Lee Lucas
Represented By: John Anderson Harp, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?