Porterfield v. Compass Bank
Plaintiff: Arnold Porterfield
Defendant: Compass Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv00465
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within. Discovery due by 1/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/15/19. (MRR, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Metheny, K)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/1/19. (MRR, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: the telephone status conference set for 10:45 a.m. on May 2, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/1/2019. (MSN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:45 a.m. on May 2, 2019. (Doc. #8 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/30/2019. (MSN)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than May 27, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after May 27, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:45 a.m. on May 2, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/16/19. (MRR, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/16/19. (MRR, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compass Bank. filed by Compass Bank (Metheny, K)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Compass Bank.(Metheny, K)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arnold Porterfield. Compass Bank served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Wrady, Joshua)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Compass Bank, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
March 20, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3304404 (B4601096201). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Compass Bank, filed by Arnold Porterfield. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Wrady, Joshua) Modified on 3/20/2019 (MRR, ).
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Compass Bank, filed by Arnold Porterfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porterfield v. Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Porterfield
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Wrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Bank
Represented By: Henry Carlton Hilson
Represented By: Amy J Wilkes
Represented By: K Bryance Metheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?