Spencer v. Citimortgage Inc
Plaintiff: James Theodore Spencer
Defendant: Citimortgage Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00481
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #25 motion for extension of time to answer. Citimortgage Inc. answer due 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 07/08/2019. (SUH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #24 Amended Complaint Motion is RIPE 7/3/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Citimortgage Inc. (Howell, Erin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Theodore Spencer.(Lay, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 motion for extension of time to amend. Plaintiff SHALL file the amended complaint by June 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 07/18/2019. (SUH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint Motion is RIPE 6/17/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by James Theodore Spencer. (Lay, Kenneth)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Disposotive Motions due by 2/24/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/12/2019. (KAM)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting the unopposed #19 motion for extension of time to amend. Plaintiff SHALL file the amended complaint by June 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 06/10/2019. (SUH)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint Motion is RIPE 6/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion is RIPE 6/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by James Theodore Spencer. (Lay, Kenneth) Modified on 6/10/2019 (KAM, ).
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keller, Richard)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/28/2019. (BST, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by James Theodore Spencer, Citimortgage Inc. (BST, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - On May 10, 2019, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss. (Doc. #9 ). In response to the motion, Plaintiff filed a motion for leave to file an amended complaint on May 23, 2019. (Doc. #14 ). Plaintiffs motion (doc. #14 ) is GRANTED. As such, the motion to dismiss (doc. #9 ) is MOOT. Plaintiff SHALL file his amended complaint by June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/24/2019. (KEK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by James Theodore Spencer. (Lay, Kenneth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by James Theodore Spencer. (Lay, Kenneth)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 6/24/2019 unless the unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 6/11/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 6/11/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/15/2019. (KAM)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/15/2019. (BST, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Defendant has filed a #9 motion to dismiss. Plaintiff SHALL respond to the motion by May 24, 2019. Any response by Defendant SHALL be filed by June 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 05/13/2019. (SUH)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Citimortgage Inc. (Keller, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Citimortgage, Inc answer due 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 4/26/2019. (SJB)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Motion is RIPE 4/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Citimortgage Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Howell, Erin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citimortgage Inc. filed by Citimortgage Inc (Howell, Erin)
April 17, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601096870 (KAM)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The 4 order to pay the filing fee is AMENDED to direct Defendant to pay the fee since Defendant removed the case from state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 04/16/2019. (SUH)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The docket sheet reflects that the Plaintiff has neither paid a filing fee or filed for an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff SHALL do one or the other by April 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 04/15/2019. (SUH)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 unopposed motion for extension of time to answer the complaint. Defendant SHALL file a responsive pleading by April 26, 2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 04/02/2019. (SUH)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 4/1/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Citimortgage Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Howell, Erin)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citimortgage Inc from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number 58-cv-2019-900212. (), filed by Citimortgage Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Citimortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Theodore Spencer
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage Inc
Represented By: Rik S Tozzi
Represented By: Richard C Keller
Represented By: Erin Cornelius Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?