Dudley v. Buffalo Rock Company et al
Appellee: Buffalo Rock Company and James C Lewis, III
Appellant: Stewart Ray Dudley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00519
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by Stewart Ray Dudley. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Williams, R)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE- Certificate of Record on Appeal (KAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2019: #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Notice of appeal, #4 Order, #5 Appellant's Designations, #6 Appellee's designation, #7 Appellee's Designation attachment) (KAM, ).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/14/2019. (KAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document Appellee Buffalo Rock Company and James C. Lee, III's Motion to File Arbitration Awards Under Seal by Buffalo Rock Company, James C Lewis, III. (Meek, Derek)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-1842-TOM-11. File received, filed by Stewart Ray Dudley. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Memo Opn & Order)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Buffalo Rock Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Buffalo Rock Company
Represented By: Marc P Solomon
Represented By: Samuel H Franklin
Represented By: Derek Firth Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James C Lewis, III
Represented By: James W Gewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stewart Ray Dudley
Represented By: R Scott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?