Odom v. Jesse Creek Mining LLC
Plaintiff: Curtis Blake Odom
Defendant: Jesse Creek Mining LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00522
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice against Defendant Jesse Creek Mining, LLC to the right of Plaintiff to petition to reinstate this action to pursue any claim embraced herein not adjudicated in, or discharged by, the proceedings in the Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/11/20198. (KAM)
May 23, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3353255, NDAL receipt #B4601097898. (McCrary, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2019 (JLC).
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance and Notice of Bankruptcy by Samuel C Stephens on behalf of Jesse Creek Mining LLC (Stephens, Samuel) Modified on 6/11/2019 (KAM, ).
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jesse Creek Mining LLC, filed by Curtis Blake Odom.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom v. Jesse Creek Mining LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Blake Odom
Represented By: Michael Vance McCrary
Represented By: Mary E. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Creek Mining LLC
Represented By: Samuel C Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?