Hines v. 3M

Plaintiff: Michael Hines, Jr
Defendant: 3M
Case Number: 2:2019cv00540
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Florida Northern for inclusion in MDL; docket entries electronically sent to Clerk of Court in District of Florida Northern. (MRR, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER- The defendant has filed an unopposed motion to stay this action pending its conditional transfer to the Northern District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Doc. #4 ). The motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/12/19. (MRR, ) Modified to add doc title on 4/15/2019 (MRR, ).
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by 3M. (Smith, Rusha)
April 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3318521 (B4601096645). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number cv201900076., filed by 3M.(MRR, ). (Smith, Rusha) Modified on 4/10/2019 (MRR, ).
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M. filed by 3M (Smith, Rusha)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number cv201900076., filed by 3M.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. 3M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hines, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Represented By: Rusha Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?