Edwards v. Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office

Plaintiff: Antoine Edwards
Defendant: Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office
Case Number: 2:2019cv00578
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The pltf filed a notice of dismissal in this action before the opposing party served either and answer or a motion for summary judgment (Doc #7 ); It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/6/19. (MRR, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: the telephone status conference set for 10:00 a.m. on May 6, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/6/2019. (MSN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Antoine Edwards (MRR, )
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than June 6, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after June 6, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on May 6, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/23/19. (MRR, )
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- The deft filed a motion to dismiss (Doc #4 ); It is ORDERED that the pltf shall file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) days; The response shall be limited to fifteen (15) pages, exclusive of exhibits; The deft shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days thereafter; The reply shall be limited to ten (10) pages, exclusive of exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/23/19. (MRR, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office. (Springfield, R)
April 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3325101 (B4601096872). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office from Small Claims Court of Jefferson County, case number SM201900318., filed by Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ). (Springfield, R) Modified on 4/17/2019 (MRR, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office. filed by Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office (Springfield, R)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office from Small Claims Court of Jefferson County, case number SM201900318., filed by Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron/ Synchrony Bank Corporate Office
Represented By: R Frank Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?