Gregory v. 1006 20th Street South LLC

Plaintiff: Steve Gregory
Defendant: 1006 20th Street South LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00581
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Gregory. 1006 20th Street South LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Zwilling, Edward)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ALIAS Summons Issued as to 1006 20th Street South LLC. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Summons Returned Unexecuted, filed by Steve Gregory. (Zwilling, Edward) Modified docket text on 6/18/2019 (KEK).
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 1006 20th Street South LLC. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
April 29, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3333408 (ALND B4601097090) related document #1 COMPLAINT against 1006 20th Street South LLC, filed by Steve Gregory.(KEK). (Zwilling, Edward) Modified on 4/29/2019 (KEK).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER - The Court recognizes that many Title III ADA claims are resolved by agreement between the parties. Therefore, the Court releases the parties from their initial obligation to confer and propose scheduling deadlines. Instead, the Court directs the parties to please make their initial disclosures within 14 days of 1006 20th Street South, LLCs appearance in this action. Within 30 days of their exchange of initial disclosures, the Court directs the parties to meet and confer to explore the possibility of settlement. Within 30 days of their meeting, the parties shall please file a joint notice apprising the Court of the status of their efforts to resolve this matter. If it does not appear that the parties are able to resolve Mr. Gregory's Title III claim through their initial discussions, then the Court will place the matter on an expedited discovery track. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/22/2019. (KEK)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1006 20th Street South LLC, filed by Steve Gregory.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. 1006 20th Street South LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1006 20th Street South LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Gregory
Represented By: Edward I Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?