Loper v. Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC
Plaintiff: Heather Loper
Defendant: Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00583
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L Maze: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2019 re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. All parties represented. Court adj. (Court Reporter Lindy M. Fuller.) (SRD)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Rule 26 Requirements. All deadlines are hereby STAYED pending the results of the motions hearing set for July 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 07-08-2019. (Maze, Corey)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The Court will be prepared to discuss all pending motions and supporting briefs at the July 9, 2019 hearing. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 07-08-2019. (Maze, Corey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss and for Remand by Heather Loper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss and for Remand)(Anderson, Kristopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Renewed - to Extend the Rule 26(f) Deadlines Pending Rulsing on Plaintiff's Motion for Dismissal and Motion for Remand by Heather Loper. (Anderson, Kristopher)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice : Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2019 10:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 6/25/2019. (SRD, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Telephone Conference set for 7/1/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Corey L Maze is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 6/25/2019. (SRD, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER Telephone Conference set for 7/1/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Corey L Maze. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 6/25/2019. (SRD, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze. Judge Annemarie Carney Axon no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00583-ACA for all subsequent pleadings. (AFS)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 Submission and Explanation of Affidavit for Further Support of Lifeguard Ambulance Service's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions to Remand and Dismiss by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC (McCoy, Douglas)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: As stated during the telephone conference, Defendant's request for additional time to file evidence in support of its response, (doc. #12 ), is GRANTED. Any such evidence is due by the close of business on Tuesday, May 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/23/2019. (CDG)
May 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 5/23/2019; Attorney Yates present by phone for ptlf; Attorney McCoy present by phone for dft; consent procedure discussed; oral request by dft for extension; separate order to be entered; conf. adj. (AVC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC. (McCoy, Douglas)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' Rule 26(f) obligations are suspended until June 10, 2019, the parties' deadline to enter an election as to the undersigned magistrate judge's dispositive jurisdiction. If the parties unanimously consent, Plaintiff may renew her request once consent is entered; if they do not unanimously consent, Plaintiff may renew her request once the case is reassigned to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/9/2019. (CDG)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Rule 26(f) Deadlines Pending Rulings on Plaintiff's Motion for Dismissal (Doc. 7) & Motion for Remand (Doc. 8) Motion is RIPE 5/9/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Heather Loper. (Anderson, Kristopher)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadlines re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Heather Loper, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Heather Loper. Any opposition to either motion is due by May 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/9/2019. (CDG)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Heather Loper. (Anderson, Kristopher)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Heather Loper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Class Action Complaint)(Anderson, Kristopher)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/25/2019. (AFS)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 6/10/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 6/10/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:45 a.m. on 5/23/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/25/2019. (AFS)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC.(McCoy, Douglas)
April 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400,(ALND receipt # B4601096893)receipt_number 1126-3325991. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2019-901153.00., filed by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(AFS). (McCoy, Douglas) Modified on 4/19/2019 (AFS).
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC. filed by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC (McCoy, Douglas)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2019-901153.00., filed by Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loper v. Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Loper
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Represented By: John Parker Yates
Represented By: Kristopher O Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC
Represented By: Douglas L McCoy
Represented By: Rodney R Cate
Represented By: Edward Thomas Rowe
Represented By: Mark D Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?