Hulsey v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Jason Hulsey
Defendant: Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo Holdings LLC, Aearo LLC and 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00635
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Hulsey. Aearo LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (JLC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Aearo Intermediate LLC. (AFS)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern District of Florida for inclusion in MDL 2885; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk mailed to Clerk of Court in District of Northern District of Florida. (AFS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Aearo Holdings LLC served; Aearo Technologies LLC served (No date on green card). (AFS)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed 3M Company served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (AFS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Holdings LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC via certified U.S. Mail on this the 3rd day of May, 2019. (JLC)
April 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601097138) receipt_number 1126-3335168. related document #1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Holdings LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, filed by Jason Hulsey.(KEK). (Bell, Bobby) Modified on 4/30/2019 (AFS).
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jason Hulsey. (KEK)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE by Jason Hulsey. (KEK)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Holdings LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, filed by Jason Hulsey.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hulsey v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hulsey
Represented By: Bobby Jewell Bell, Jr
Represented By: Tyler C Vail
Represented By: Ashley Paige Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Intermediate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?