Rickett v. National Credit Adjusters LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Rickett
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters LLC and Reviver Financial LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00646
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER denying #9 Motion for Entry of Default. See Doc. #11 .Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 6/11/2019. (SJB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Sherry Rickett Settlement (Philipps, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default Motion is RIPE 5/29/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Sherry Rickett. filed by Sherry Rickett (Philipps, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Motion is RIPE 5/29/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Sherry Rickett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A)(Philipps, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Rickett. National Credit Adjusters LLC served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019; Reviver Financial LLC served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (KAM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Botes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Botes, Bradford)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to National Credit Adjusters LLC, Reviver Financial LLC. mailed certified mail (KAM)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 5/01/2019. (SJB)
April 29, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3334961. (Philipps, David)
April 29, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3334958. (Philipps, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3334954. related document #1 COMPLAINT against National Credit Adjusters LLC, Reviver Financial LLC, filed by Sherry Rickett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KEK). (Philipps, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Motion is RIPE 4/29/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Sherry Rickett. (Attachments: #1 Consent of local counsel)(KEK)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sherry Rickett. (KEK)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Credit Adjusters LLC, Reviver Financial LLC, filed by Sherry Rickett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rickett v. National Credit Adjusters LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Rickett
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: David J Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reviver Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?