Waid et al v. Mission Coal Company, LLC

Appellant: Joann Waid and Lennis L. Waid
Appellee: Mission Coal Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00647
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to re #15 filed by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. (McArdle, Walter)
June 28, 2019 Motions terminated: #16 MOTION to Strike Record on Appeal filed by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid in light of Appellants' withdrawal of the motion, (doc. 18). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 06/28/2019. (LMG)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Appellants' "Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Record on Appeal." (Doc. 17). Appellants' "Motion to Strike Record on Appeal," (doc. 16), is withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 06/28/2019. (LMG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw #16 MOTION to Strike Record on Appeal by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. (McArdle, Walter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 **WITHDRAWN - per Text Order 18** MOTION to Strike Record on Appeal by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. (McArdle, Walter) Modified on 7/1/2019 (FNC).
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Mission Coal Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Deborah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D Sparks on behalf of Mission Coal Company, LLC (Sparks, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Alley Smith on behalf of Mission Coal Company, LLC (Smith, Deborah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF RECORD ON APPEAL. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Amended Designation, #2 Exhibit 1)(JLC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Appelle's Designation. (Attachments: #1 395, #2 451, #3 490, #4 524, #5 547, #6 618, #7 681, #8 682, #9 685, #10 686, #11 731, #12 732, #13 758, #14 762, #15 769, #16 911, #17 914, #18 1052, #19 1057, #20 1190, #21 1191, #22 1193, #23 1194, #24 1195, #25 1202, #26 1204, #27 1209, #28 1211, #29 1212, #30 1215, #31 1220, #32 1221, #33 1237, #34 1239, #35 1272, #36 1282, #37 1353)(894 to large to upload)(JLC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #38 894 Part 1, #39 894 Part 2) (JLC). Modified on 6/12/2019 (JLC).
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Appellant's Designation. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 290, #3 291, #4 393, #5 436a, #6 436b, #7 436c, #8 436d, #9 522, #10 523, #11 606, #12 691, #13 698, #14 736, #15 891, #16 899, #17 915, #18 922, #19 935, #20 1007, #21 1051, #22 1127, #23 1322, #24 1324, #25 1325, #26 1352, #27 1356, #28 1374, #29 1375, #30 1384, #31 1392, #32 1393, #33 1399, #34 1407, #35 1412, #36 1441 Amended Appellant Designation, #37 McCardle Exhibits at Trial 1a, #38 McCardle Exhibits at Trial 1b, #39 McCardle Exhibits at Trial 1c, #40 McCardle Exhibits at Trial 1d, #41 McCardle Exhibits at Trial 1e, #42 McCardle Exhibits at Trial 2)(JLC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Record On Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Order Approving Sale, #2 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan, #3 Notice of Appeal, #4 Notice of Appeal, #5 Motion to Stay, #6 Order Denying Motion, #7 Certification of No Transcript Ordered) # 8 Docket Sheet) Modified on 6/10/2019 (JLC).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time and Re-Docketing of Submission Sheet on Notice of Appeal filed by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court to file with this Court the complete record once it is available. The Briefing Deadlines under Rule 8018(a) will betriggered once the complete record has been docketed. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/10/2019. (JLC)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time and Re-Docketing of Submission Sheet on Notice of Appeal by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. (McArdle, Walter)
May 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal. Responses due on or before June 14, 2019. Replies due on or before June 28, 2019. (JLC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. The Appellees' Response to the Motion to Stay Pending Appeal due on or before June 14, 2019. Any Reply Brief due on or before June 28, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/24/2019. (JLC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(McArdle, Walter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by D Christopher Carson on behalf of Debtor in Possession Lenders, First Lien Lenders (Carson, D)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Hall on behalf of First Lien Lenders, Debtor in Possession Lenders (Hall, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PARTIES. (JLC)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-04177-TOM-11. File received, filed by Joann Waid, Lennis L. Waid. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Approving Sale, #3 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan, #4 Motion to Stay, #5 Docket Sheet, #6 Submission Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waid et al v. Mission Coal Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joann Waid
Represented By: Walter F McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lennis L. Waid
Represented By: Walter F McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mission Coal Company, LLC
Represented By: Bill D Bensinger
Represented By: Deborah Alley Smith
Represented By: Daniel D Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?