Morris v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Kaylan Morris
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00650
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER (AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/10/19. (MRR, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of the Agreed Confidentiality Order by Walmart Inc., Kaylan Morris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gresham, Cole) Modified text to add filer on 9/6/2019 (MRR, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 Agreed Confidentiality Order by Walmart Inc. (Gresham, Cole) Modified text on 9/6/2019 (MRR, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY in Further Support of the #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed by Walmart Inc. (Gresham, Cole) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MRR, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kaylan Morris. (Bartlett, Taylor) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (MRR, ).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for Friday, 7/19/2019 at 4:30 PM is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/18/2019. (KMAW)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/17/19. (MRR, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response is due on or before 8/12/2019. Defendant's reply is due on or before 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/17/2019. (KMAW)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Kaylan Morris, Walmart Inc (Bartlett, Taylor) Modified to add filer on 7/17/2019 (MRR, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 29, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 29, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 4:30 p.m. on July 19, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/16/19. (MRR, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Pending before the court is Defendant's #11 Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint. On or before 7/29/2019, Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion, and Defendant may file a reply on or before 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/15/2019. (KMAW)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gresham, Cole)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. filed by Walmart Inc (Gresham, Cole)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint by Walmart Inc. (Gresham, Cole)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Wesley B Gilchrist terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/5/2019. (PMA)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion is RIPE 6/4/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Walmart Inc. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cole Robinson Gresham on behalf of Walmart Inc (Gresham, Cole)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Walmart Inc, but only to the extent that the defendant is given an additional 21 days. Answer due 6/14/2019. To the extent that the defendant seeks more time, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/23/2109. (PMA)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 5/22/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Walmart Inc. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Walmart Inc served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (MRR, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Walmart Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Kaylan Morris. (Bartlett, Taylor)
April 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3335953 (ALNDCLERK19-0017). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc, filed by Kaylan Morris.(MRR, ). (Bartlett, Taylor) Modified on 5/1/2019 (MRR, ).
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc, filed by Kaylan Morris.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylan Morris
Represented By: Taylor Akers Pruett
Represented By: Taylor C Bartlett
Represented By: J Stuart McAtee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Cole Robinson Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?