Marshall v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Marshall
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metlife Services & Solutions LLC and International Buisiness Machines Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00686
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metlife Services & Solutions LLC. filed by Metlife Services & Solutions LLC (Miller, T)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Miller, T)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Buisiness Machines Corporation. filed by International Buisiness Machines Corporation (Kimble, Cavender)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER IN ERISA BENEFITS CASES. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/17/2019. (KAM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metlife Services & Solutions LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Miller, T)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by International Buisiness Machines Corporation.(Kimble, Cavender)
May 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Metlife Services & Solutions LLC answer due 6/17/2019; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer due 6/17/2019. (KAM)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER-This case is before the court on the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings #8 filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Defendant MetLife Services and Solutions, LLC. The Motion #8 is GRANTED. On or before June 17, 2019, Defendants SHALL file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/31/2019. (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Metlife Services & Solutions LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Miller, T)
May 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines: International Buisiness Machines Corporation Answer due on or before June 17, 2019. (JLC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER; This matter is before the court on Defendant IBM's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. #6 The Motion #6 is GRANTED. IBM SHALL respond to the Complaint on or before June 17, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/24/2019. (JLC)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by International Buisiness Machines Corporation. (Kimble, Cavender)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Marshall. International Buisiness Machines Corporation served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019; Metlife Services & Solutions LLC served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (KAM,)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Marshall. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (KAM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to International Buisiness Machines Corporation, Metlife Services & Solutions LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company mailed certified mail (KAM)
May 7, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3340669, NDAL receipt #B4601097451. (Williams, Miles) Modified on 5/7/2019 (JLC).
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jeffrey Marshall. (Williams, Miles)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Buisiness Machines Corporation, Metlife Services & Solutions LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, filed by Jeffrey Marshall.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Marshall
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: T Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Services & Solutions LLC
Represented By: T Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Buisiness Machines Corporation
Represented By: Cavender C Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?