Parker v. Petrovics et al
Plaintiff: A Johnson Parker
Defendant: Andrew Petrovics, Pointz Inc, Innovation Depot Inc and Kathleen Hamrick
Case Number: 2:2019cv00699
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Innovation Depot Inc. (AFS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kathleen Hamrick served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (AFS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pointz Inc served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (AFS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A Johnson Parker. Andrew Petrovics served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (KEK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kathleen Hamrick, Innovation Depot Inc, Andrew Petrovics, Pointz Inc. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
May 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3341754. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Hamrick, Innovation Depot Inc, Andrew Petrovics, Pointz Inc, filed by A Johnson Parker.(AFS). (Pantazis, Evan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by A Johnson Parker. (AFS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Hamrick, Innovation Depot Inc, Andrew Petrovics, Pointz Inc, filed by A Johnson Parker.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Petrovics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Petrovics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pointz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovation Depot Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Johnson Parker
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: Evan Dennis Pantazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?