Hardy et al v. Well Fargo Bank NA

Plaintiff: Lemuel Ledell Hardy and Mary Elaine Hardy, Estate of
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00719
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/30/19. (MRR, )
May 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 5/29/2019; attys Jameria Moore and Ryan Rummage present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 8, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 8, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/29/19. (MRR, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Manley, Reid)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 "TEXT ORDER: This matter is SET for a telephone teleconference at 10:00 a.m. on May 29, 2019. The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 five minutes before the telephone conference is scheduled to begin. The access code is 2778178." Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/22/2019. (JLC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3344032 (B4601097614). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Well Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-901646., filed by Well Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ). (Manley, Reid) Modified on 5/10/2019 (MRR, ).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ORDER- (Doc 1-1 p.91) Deemed filed 4/15/19, Circuit Court of Jefferson County. Signed by Circuit Judge Elisabeth A French on 4/15/19. (MRR, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Well Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-901646., filed by Well Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. Well Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lemuel Ledell Hardy
Represented By: Jameria Johnson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Elaine Hardy, Estate of
Represented By: Jameria Johnson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?