R. v. Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Andrea R.
Defendant: Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama and Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School
Case Number: 2:2019cv00752
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Education
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/9/19. (MRR, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 Joint REPLY in Support of #6 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School. (Gilmer, William) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (MRR, ).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: the telephone status conference set for 10:30 a.m. on July 8, 2019; is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/3/2019. (MSN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Andrea R.. (Rhea, Ashley)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 29, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 29, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on July 8, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/14/19. (MRR, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- It is ORDERED that the pltf shall file a response to the motion for more definite statement (Doc #6 ) within fourteen (14) calendar days; The response shall be limited to fifteen (15) pages; The defts shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days thereafter; Any reply shall be limited to ten (10) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/14/19. (MRR, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School. (Gilmer, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea R.. Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Rhea, Ashley)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea R.. Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Rhea, Ashley)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
May 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3349339 (B4601097786). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrea R..(MRR, ). (Rhea, Ashley) Modified on 5/20/2019 (MRR, ).
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrea R..(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. v. Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea R.
Represented By: Ashley Rose Rhea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama
Represented By: William Lee Gilmer
Represented By: John F Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School
Represented By: William Lee Gilmer
Represented By: John F Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?