Dawson v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Tracy Jones Dawson
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00755
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline re #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 2nd Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. Any opposition is due by July 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 7/15/2019. (CDG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition to re #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 2nd Motion to Amend Complaint by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Clark, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss, (doc. 7), is due by July 12, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/27/2019. (CDG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Respond to Motion to Dismiss Motion is RIPE 6/27/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Clark, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Stay.The parties' Rule 26(f) obligations are stayed through the consent deadline of August 5, 2019. If the parties consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, the undersigned will leave the stay in place until there is a ruling on the pending motion to dismiss. If consent is not entered, the district judge to whom this case is reassigned will reevaluate the stay upon receiving the case and may or may not leave the stay in place beyond the consent deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/25/2019. (CDG)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 8/5/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 8/5/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 7/19/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay RULE 26 OBLIGATIONS AND DISCOVERY by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Hess, Joshua)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. Plaintiff's response is due by July 3, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by July 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/19/2019. (CDG)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hess, Joshua)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation, filed by Tracy Jones Dawson.(Clark, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/22/2019. (CDG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/22/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Hess, Joshua)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation (Hess, Joshua)
May 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number (ALND B4601097791) 1126-3349552. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2019-900319.00., filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AFS). (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 5/20/2019 (AFS).
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2019-900319.00., filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Represented By: Jeffrey M Grantham
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Jones Dawson
Represented By: Brian M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?