Evans v. Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc

Plaintiff: Edgar Evans
Defendant: Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00769
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edgar Evans. Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc. served but delivery date omitted. (JLC)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Edgar Evans as to Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc. (KAM)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3353671 (ALND B4601097927) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc, filed by Edgar Evans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM). (Fonteneau, Kira) Modified on 5/24/2019 (KEK).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Conflict Disclosure Statement by Edgar Evans (KAM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Edgar Evans. (KAM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc, filed by Edgar Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Evans
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Hide & Tallow Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?