Davis v. Bunge North America

Plaintiff: James Davis
Defendant: Bunge North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00775
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/11/19. (MRR, )
July 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 7/11/2019; attys Christina Malmat and Gordon Blair present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:00 a.m. on July 11, 2019. (Doc. #7 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/11/2019. (MSN)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/24/19. (MRR, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than August 2, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after August 2, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on July 11, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/24/19. (MRR, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bunge North America. filed by Bunge North America (Glenos, Amy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bunge North America.(Blair, Gordon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Davis. Bunge North America served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Goldfarb, Jon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bunge North America, returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 22nd day of May, 2019. (JLC)
May 22, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3352325, NDAL receipt #B4601097857.(Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 5/22/2019 (JLC).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bunge North America, filed by James Davis.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Bunge North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davis
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunge North America
Represented By: Amy Quick Glenos
Represented By: Gordon L Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?