Crosier v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Plaintiff: Edna Jane Crosier
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00780
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - This case is before the court on Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Doc. #19 ). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/15/2019. (KEK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Edna Jane Crosier (Lay, Kenneth)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER the court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint on the court docket by July 12, 2019. The court WARNS Plaintiff that failure to comply with this Order or any other court Order MAY result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/10/2019. (KAM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER-This case is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. #16 . The Motion #16 is GRANTED. On or before July 8, 2019, Plaintiff SHALL file an Amended Complaint on the court docket. Consequently, because upon the filing of the amended pleading, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #7 will no longer be directed at the operative pleading, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/21/2019. (KAM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Edna Jane Crosier. (Lay, Kenneth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Edna Jane Crosier. (Lay, Kenneth)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/11/2019. (KAM)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #7 and Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery #11 . Before the case was reassigned to the undersigned, a briefing schedule for the Motion was set. 8 . Accordingly, the undersigned ADOPTS the previously issued briefing schedule. On or before June 19, 2019, Plaintiff MAY file her response brief. Any reply should by filed by June 26, 2019. Additionally, Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery #11 is GRANTED. All discovery, including the parties' Rule 26(f) obligation, is STAYED pending the court's ruling on the Motion to Dismiss #7 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/11/2019. (KAM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge R David Proctor. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00780-RDP for all subsequent pleadings. The status conference set for 7/8/19 is CANCELLED. (AFS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/6/2019. (AFS)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 7/22/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 7/22/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:45 a.m. on 7/8/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/6/2019. (AFS)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #7 Motion to Dismiss. Any opposition to the motion must be filed by June 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 06/06/2019. (CLS2)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note)(Rummage, Ryan)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/31/2019. (CDG)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/31/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by June 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/28/2019. (CDG)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/28/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
May 23, 2019 Filing Fee received from Reid S Manley in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3353402; USDC receipt number B4601097920; related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, NA from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900401.00., filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AFS). (Manley, Reid) Modified on 5/23/2019 (KWC)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, NA from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900401.00., filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosier v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Jane Crosier
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?