Ruffin et al v. American Honda Motor Co Inc
Plaintiff: Tomeka Ruffin
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00782
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The Court will consider these matters at the pro ami hearing set for Thursday, August 22, 2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B. The Court appoints Anne Durward of Massey, Stotser & Nichols PC, 1780 Gadsen Highway, Birmingham, Alabama 35235 (205-838-9005), as guardian ad litem for the minor children for the purposes of evaluating the terms of the proposed settlement and attending the hearing set for August 22, 2019. The defendants shall bear all expenses of the guardian ad litem. The Court directs the guardian ad litem to file a written report which addresses the topics enumerated above. The report should be submitted by 4:30 PM on Monday, August 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/18/2019. (KEK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Approve Settlement and Motion to Appoint GAL by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (Strubel, J)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/24/2019. (KEK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Honda Motor Co Inc. filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc (Strubel, J)
May 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3353382 (ALND B4601097899) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Motor Co Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama (Bessemer), case number 68-cv-2019-900079, filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Pleadings 1-14, # 2 Pleadings 15-22, # 3 Pleadings 23-32, # 4 Pleadings 33-39, # 5 Pleadings 40-41, # 6 Pleadings 42-48, # 7 Pleadings 49-60, # 8 Pleadings 61)(KEK). (Strubel, J) Modified on 5/24/2019 (KEK).
May 22, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Honda Motor Co Inc. *See Doc 1, # 5* (KEK)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Motor Co Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama (Bessemer), case number 68-cv-2019-900079, filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Pleadings 1-14, #2 Pleadings 15-22, #3 Pleadings 23-32, #4 Pleadings 33-39, #5 Pleadings 40-41, #6 Pleadings 42-48, #7 Pleadings 49-60, #8 Pleadings 61)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin et al v. American Honda Motor Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka Ruffin
Represented By: Benjamin L Locklar
Represented By: Anne Lamkin Durward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: H Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?