Sutton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,
Plaintiff: Lashun Sutton
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,
Case Number: 2:2019cv00881
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/17/19. (MRR, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/16/19. (MRR, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than August 26, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after August 26, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on August 8, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/16/19. (MRR, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Lashun Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Palmer, Lynlee) Modified to add filer on 7/16/2019 (MRR, ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Palmer, Lynlee)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,. filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., (Palmer, Lynlee)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,.(Palmer, Lynlee)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/20/19. (MRR, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,. (Palmer, Lynlee)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (JLC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Scott Harbuck on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., (Harbuck, Jonathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT. (JLC)
June 10, 2019 Filing Fee received from Lynlee Wells Palmer in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3364451; USDC receipt number B4601098306; related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2019-902186.00, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC). (Palmer, Lynlee) Modified on 6/10/2019 (KWC)
June 7, 2019 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,, filed by Lashun Sutton. (Deemed filed 5/14/2019 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A).(JLC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2019-902186.00., filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.,
Represented By: Lynlee Wells Palmer
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Harbuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashun Sutton
Represented By: W Cone Owen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?