Pickard v. Wren et al

Plaintiff: William Marshall Pickard, III
Defendant: Deborah Wren, Nikeshia Bailey, Highland Manor and SPM Property Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00885
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Information re #44 EMERGENCY MOTION for Ruling Infractions and HUD Rules Violation by William Marshall Pickard, III. (JLC)
August 6, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE to re #45 Exhibit A to Defendants' Response filed by Nikeshia Bailey, Highland Manor, SPM Property Management LLC, Deborah Wren. (Geisler, Kimberly)
August 6, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION for HUD Rules Ruling or Alternatively for a Stay of Lease Termination Proceedings or Alternatviley for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Nikeshia Bailey, Highland Manor, SPM Property Management LLC, Deborah Wren. (Geisler, Kimberly)
August 6, 2019 Filing 44 EMERGENCY MOTION for Ruling Infractions and HUD Rules Violation by William Marshall Pickard, III. (JLC)
August 2, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for HUD Rules Ruling or Alternatively for a Stay of Lease Termination Proceedings or Alternatviley for a Preliminary Injunction by William Marshall Pickard, III. (JLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - On July 30, 2019, this case came before the court for a status conference. (Doc. #21 ). By agreement of the parties, all pending motions in this case are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. The court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file his amended complaint on or before August 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/1/2019. (KEK)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - This case is SET for a status conference on Tuesday, August 6, 2019, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 6B of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203. The court DIRECTS Plaintiff William Marshall Pickard III, proceeding pro se, and counsel for Defendants to attend the conference in person. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/1/2019. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Status Conference held on 7/30/2019; present were Mr. Pickard & attorneys Gamble and Geisler; court will hold another status conference in one week. (SAC )
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #36 Second Amendment to Name Defendants by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Seal Notice of Filing State Petition by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Filing 36 SECOND AMENDMENT to Name Defendants and Damages and to Amend Damages for Bailey and Wren by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Rulings on Critical Issues in Status Conference by William Marshall Pickard, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(KEK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 34 SECOND MOTION to Hold Defendant Bailey in Contempt by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Hold Defendant Bailey in Contempt by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of filing: Request to Correct Dates in #30 and #28 by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Strike Motions filed by Defendant Geisler by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's "First Amended Complaint" filed by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of filing: Amendment to Name Defendants by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of filing: Request for the Guidance of the Court by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 OBJECTION to Defendants Defiance and Misrepresentation of Court's Order and for Additional Sanctions filed by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Defendants, Nikeshia Bailey and Deborah Wren filed a Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law on July 15, 2019 #20 . If the Plaintiff would like to file a written response to this motion, he should do so no later than August 8, 2019. If Defendants wish to file a reply, they should do so no later than August 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/18/19. (SAC )
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's "First Amended Complaint" by Nikeshia Bailey, Highland Manor, SPM Property Management LLC, Deborah Wren. (Geisler, Kimberly)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike #22 Notice (Other) Notice of Additional Defendants and Defendants Wren and Baileys Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Nikeshia Bailey, Highland Manor, SPM Property Management LLC, Deborah Wren. (Geisler, Kimberly)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #20 ; and MOTION for Sanctions by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Additional Defendants Kimberly Geisler and Kara Gamble by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - This case is SET for a status conference on Tuesday, July 30, 2019, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 6B of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203. The court DIRECTS Plaintiff William Marshall Pickard III, proceeding pro se, and counsel for Defendants to attend the conference in person. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/15/2019. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Nikeshia Bailey, Deborah Wren. (Geisler, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Highland Manor. filed by Highland Manor (Geisler, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPM Property Management LLC. filed by SPM Property Management LLC (Geisler, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly W Geisler on behalf of All Defendants (Geisler, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nikeshia Bailey, Deborah Wren, Highland Manor, SPM Property Management LLC, filed by William Marshall Pickard, III. (Attachments: #1 Addendum I, #2 Addendum II, #3 Addendum III)(KEK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to file amended complaint out of time by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Marshall Pickard, III. Nikeshia Bailey served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Deborah Wren served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (KEK)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Because Mr. Pickard has failed to satisfy the requirements necessary toobtain a temporary restraining order, the court DENIES the motion (doc. #5 ). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/20/2019. (KEK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 ***Document Sealed - Supplemental, Exigent Grounds for Issuance of a Temporary Restraining Order. *Deemed filed 6/12/19* (KEK)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Currently before the court is Plaintiffs Ex Parte Plea Under Seal. (Doc. #6 ). The court construes Plaintiffs filing as a motion to file under seal. The court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to file under seal Plaintiffs Supplemental, Exigent Grounds for Issuance of Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/17/2019. (KEK)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #5 - Because Defendants have not yet been served or filed an answer, Plaintiff is entitled to amend the complaint as a matter of right. (Id.). Accordingly, the court DENIES Plaintiffs motion as moot and will allow Plaintiff to amend the complaint without leave of court. Therefore, the court DIRECTS Plaintiff to re-file the amended complaint (doc. #5 ), along with the exhibits included in the initial complaint (doc. #1 -1; doc. #1 -2), as a single document on or before July 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/17/2019. (KEK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nikeshia Bailey, Deborah Wren. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - On June 13, 2019, the court granted Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. #7 ). Because Plaintiff has not yet served Defendants, the court is obligated to issue Plaintiffs process to a United States Marshal who must in turn effectuate service upon the Defendants. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/13/2019. (KEK)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff has submitted a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Doc. #2 ). The court finds that Plaintiff is indigent, and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (doc. #2 ), is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file this action without prepayment of a fee and to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/13/2019. (KEK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing: Ex Parte Plea Under Seal by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Supplemental Pleading by William Marshall Pickard, III. (KEK) ("TRO Requested" noted on pg. 1) Modified on 6/11/2019 (SAC ).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. (AFS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 6/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by William M Pickard, III. (AFS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nikeshia Bailey, Deborah Wren, filed by William M Pickard, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AFS) ("TRO Requested" noted on pg. 1) Modified on 6/11/2019 (SAC ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickard v. Wren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Wren
Represented By: Kara Deal Gamble
Represented By: Kimberly W Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikeshia Bailey
Represented By: Kara Deal Gamble
Represented By: Kimberly W Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Manor
Represented By: Kara Deal Gamble
Represented By: Kimberly W Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPM Property Management LLC
Represented By: Kara Deal Gamble
Represented By: Kimberly W Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Marshall Pickard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?