Thomas v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Eric Thomas
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00892
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.(McGivaren, Crawford)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Norfolk Southern Corporation answer due 8/8/2019; Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc answer due 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 7/17/2019. (SJB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 7/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (McGivaren, Crawford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Thomas. Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (KEK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
June 14, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3368359. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, filed by Eric Thomas.(KEK). (Edwards, Nicole)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Eric Thomas. (KEK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, filed by Eric Thomas.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Thomas
Represented By: Blake Clifton Edwards
Represented By: Nicole Davis Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?