Coleman v. McLemore et al
Plaintiff: Demarcus Coleman
Defendant: Zackery McLemore, A.D.O.C., C.O. Gadson, Joel Binder and C.O. Speaks
Case Number: 2:2019cv00899
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Zackery McLemore., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zackery McLemore. (Bledsoe, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by C.O. Gadson., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C.O. Gadson. (Bledsoe, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by C.O. Speaks., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C.O. Speaks. (Bledsoe, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Joel Binder., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joel Binder. Joel Binder waiver sent on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/22/2019. (Bledsoe, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER the motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. #4 .The plaintiff's motions for discovery are DENIED as PREMATURE. #5 and #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/22/2019. (PSM)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 60 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/22/2019. (PSM)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of DEMARCUS COLEMAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/22/2019. (PSM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendants Zackery McLemore, C.O. Gadson, C.O. Binder and C.O. Speaks by Demarcus Coleman.(JLC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Inquiry by Demarcus Coleman. (JLC)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Demarcus Coleman re #3 Order. (KWC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery by Demarcus Coleman. (KWC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Demarcus Coleman. (KWC)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/18/2019. (cm to pla) (KWC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Demarcus Coleman. (JLC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.D.O.C., Joel Binder, C.O. Gadson, Zackery McLemore, C.O. Speaks, filed by Demarcus Coleman.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. McLemore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zackery McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Gadson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Speaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarcus Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?