PNC Bank National Association v. Charter South Inc
Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Defendant: Charter South Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00902
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re PNC Bank's MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment, to the extent Charter South wishes to be heard on the pending motion, it has until 8/13/2019 to file a response. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/31/2019. (AFS)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Charter South Inc. (AFS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Charter South, Inc. by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Affidavit as to Attorney Fees, #3 Exhibit Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit Amended and Reinstated Note, #5 Exhibit Amended and Restated Security Agreement, #6 Text of Proposed Order Default Judgment Proposed Order)(Johanson, Charles)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Charter South, Inc. by PNC Bank National Association. (Johanson, Charles)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE by PNC Bank National Association re #2 Summons Issued by Certified Mail (Clark, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charter South Inc. given back to Plaintiff for service. (AFS)
June 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, (ALND B 4601098385) receipt_number 1126-3366347. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Charter South Inc, filed by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(AFS). (Johanson, Charles) Modified on 6/12/2019 (AFS).
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter South Inc, filed by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank National Association v. Charter South Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter South Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Represented By: Charles R Johanson, III
Represented By: Robert Tyler Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?