Shields v. Leeds, City of
Plaintiff: John Shields
Defendant: Leeds, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv00922
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Graham on behalf of Leeds, City of (Graham, Grace)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-922-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
July 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Leeds, City of answer due 8/18/2019. (MRR, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leeds, City of. Leeds, City of waiver sent on 6/19/19, answer due 8/18/19. (Owens, J) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (MRR, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by J Bentley Owens, III on behalf of Leeds, City of (Owens, J)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by John Shields. (Morro, Scott)
June 19, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3371730 (B4601098527). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Leeds, City of, filed by John Shields.(MRR, ). (Morro, Scott) Modified on 6/19/2019 (MRR, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leeds, City of, filed by John Shields.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Leeds, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeds, City of
Represented By: Grace Graham
Represented By: J Bentley Owens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shields
Represented By: Scott Thomas Morro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?