Woodham v. Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Woodham
Defendant: Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The and Corridor Group Inc, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv00940
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/31/19. (MRR, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: telephone status conference set for 11:00 a.m. on July 31, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/31/2019. (MSN)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 11:00 a.m. on July 31, 2019. (Doc. #10 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/29/2019. (MSN)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 3, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after September 3, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on July 31, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/18/19. (MRR, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/18/19. (MRR, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Sheffield on behalf of Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The, Corridor Group Inc, The (Sheffield, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The, Corridor Group Inc, The. filed by Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The, Corridor Group Inc, The (Sheffield, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The, Corridor Group Inc, The.(Scott, Stephen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Woodham. Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Blizzard, H)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Woodham. Corridor Group Inc, The served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Blizzard, H)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The, Corridor Group Inc, The, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
June 20, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601098554 (MRR, )
June 20, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Jonathan Woodham. (MRR, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The, Corridor Group Inc, The, filed by Jonathan Woodham.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodham v. Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corridor Group Holdings LLC, The
Represented By: John W Sheffield
Represented By: Stephen L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corridor Group Inc, The
Represented By: John W Sheffield
Represented By: Stephen L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Woodham
Represented By: H Wallace Blizzard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?