Stewart v. Homewood, AL, City of et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Stewart
Defendant: Police Officer Nicholas Altobella, Police Chief Tim Ross, Homewood, AL, City of and Police Officer Rodney Adams
Case Number: 2:2019cv00955
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rodney Adams, Nicholas Altobella, Homewood, AL, City of, Tim Ross. (Morse, Wayne)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Timothy Stewart. (Bell, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-955-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. The status conference set for August 5, 2019 is CANCELLED (MRR, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 6, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after September 6, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:30 a.m. on August 5, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/24/19. (MRR, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiff is ORDERED to file any response to the defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. #6 ) within fourteen (14) calendar days of the date of this order. The defendants SHALL file any reply within seven (7) calendar days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/24/19. (MRR, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rodney Adams, Nicholas Altobella, Homewood, AL, City of, Tim Ross. (Morse, Wayne)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Rodney Adams, Nicholas Altobella, Homewood, AL, City of, Tim Ross. (Morse, Wayne)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Presently pending is the motion to allow Carlos Eugene Moore to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the plaintiff. (Doc. #2 ). The motion, which is accompanied by the required fee and provides the information required by Local Rule 83.1, is GRANTED. Also pending is the motion to allow Michael Terrell Bell to serve as local counsel for the plaintiff; the motion is GRANTED. (Doc. #3 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/10/19. (MRR, )
June 24, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3375837 (B4601098604). (Bell, Michael) Modified on 6/24/2019 (MRR, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3375820 (B4601098603). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy Stewart. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service)(MRR, ). (Bell, Michael) Modified on 6/24/2019 (MRR, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Consent to Serve as Local Counsel by Timothy Stewart. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(MRR, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carlos E. Moore Motion is RIPE 6/21/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Timothy Stewart. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(MRR, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of service)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Homewood, AL, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Nicholas Altobella
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Represented By: Michael G Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief Tim Ross
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Represented By: Michael G Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homewood, AL, City of
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Represented By: Michael G Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Rodney Adams
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Represented By: Michael G Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Stewart
Represented By: Michael Terrell Bell
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?