O'Toole v. The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Joseph F. O'Toole, Jr.
Defendant: Julie Emory Johnson, Robert J. Sullivan and The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama
Case Number: 2:2019cv01092
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John E Ott: Telephone Conference held on 9/6/2019. (BST, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Friday, 9/6/19; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 9:00 AM on Friday, 9/6/19, the conference will be cancelled. (BST)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Lee Oliver, III on behalf of Julie Emory Johnson, Robert J. Sullivan, The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama (Oliver, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 9/23/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 9/6/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/8/2019. (KAM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/8/2019. (BST)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Julie Emory Johnson, Robert J. Sullivan, The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama.(Yuengert, Anne)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph F. O'Toole, Jr. Julie Emory Johnson served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; Robert J. Sullivan served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (KAM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Julie Emory Johnson, Robert J. Sullivan and The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama via certified U.S. Mail on this the 15th day of July, 2019. (JLC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Joseph F. O'Toole, Jr. (Saxon, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3389131, NDAL receipt #B4601099109. (Saxon, John) Modified on 7/15/2019 (JLC).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julie Emory Johnson, Robert J. Sullivan, The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama, filed by Joseph F. O'Toole, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Toole v. The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Emory Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Diocese of Birmingham in Alabama
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F. O'Toole, Jr.
Represented By: John D Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?