Lawrence et al v. Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc
Plaintiff: John Lawrence and Jessica Hunter
Defendant: Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc and Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01095
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc returned to Plaintiff for Service. (AFS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc. (AFS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.(Rowe, Stanley)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ford Motor Credit Company LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (AFS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jessica Hunter, John Lawrence. (Seals, W)
July 15, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3390087 (ALND B4601099154). (Seals, W) Modified on 7/17/2019 (AFS).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc, filed by John Lawrence, Jessica Hunter.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence et al v. Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lawrence
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hunter
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Recovery Service of Alabama Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Represented By: Stanley Dagnal Rowe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?