Simpson et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc, Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-R11 et al
Plaintiff: Sheena Simpson and Darrell Wayne Simpson
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc, Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-R11
Case Number: 2:2019cv01110
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER The court corrects a scrivener's error made in the Scheduling Order #8 - The sentence that reads "The parties shall be ready for trial in January 2020..." should instead read "The parties shall be ready for trial in January 2021". Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/29/19. (SAC )
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown - Discovery due by 2/28/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/12/2020; Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/25/19. (SAC )
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shaner, John)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER The court GRANTS #5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice as to Amanda K. Blackmon. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/9/19. (SAC )
August 5, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Amanda K. Blackmon in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3405021, NDAL receipt #B4601099633. (Shaner, John) Modified on 8/5/2019 (JLC).
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Application for Admission) by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Shaner, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.(Shaner, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3394720 (ALND B4601099277) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-902614, filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Shaner, John) Modified on 7/22/2019 (KEK).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/18/19. (SAC )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL INTEREST DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (KEK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-902614, filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc, Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-R11 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: John Houston Shaner
Represented By: Amanda K Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc, Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-R11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Simpson
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Wayne Simpson
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?