Haggard v. Montgomery
Plaintiff: Rhonda Haggard
Defendant: Officer Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2019cv01111
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Defendant Pollard for his Personal Representative by Rhonda Haggard. (McCants, Terrell)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Death by Officer Montgomery (Sides, Terry)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f)- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/30/2019. (KSS)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/27/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 9:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/29/2019. (AFS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Officer Montgomery.(Sides, Terry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Limited Discovery by Rhonda Haggard. (McCants, Terrell)
July 16, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3391431 (ALND B4601099177) (Sides, Terry) Modified on 7/17/2019 (AFS).
July 16, 2019 COMPLAINT against Officer Montgomery, filed by Rhonda Haggard. (Deemed filed 6/10/2019 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A).(JLC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL w/Exhibits A-C attached by Officer Montgomery from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2019-902585.00., filed by Officer Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haggard v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Montgomery
Represented By: Terry A Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Haggard
Represented By: Terrell E McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?