King et al v. UA Local 91 et al
Plaintiff: Nolan Jones, Jr., Chris Samuel, Anthony Robinson, Brian Struggs and Ronald King
Defendant: United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Union of Plumbers, Fitters, Welders and Service Technicians, UA Local 91, Day & Zimmerman, Inc., Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc. and United Association of Plumbers, Steamfitters, Welders and HVAC Technicians
Case Number: 2:2019cv01115
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jade E Sipes on behalf of Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc. (Sipes, Jade)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jade E Sipes on behalf of Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc. (Sipes, Jade)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc. (Busey, Zachary)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary B. Busey by Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc.. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/30/19. (EBM)
August 29, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Zachary B. Busey in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3423841, NDAL receipt #B4601100220. (Karlson, Daisy) Modified on 8/30/2019 (JLC).
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary B. Busey by Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Karlson, Daisy)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants Day & Zimmermann NPS, Inc. and Day & Zimmermann, Inc.'s "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond." (Doc. 8). Their responsive pleadings are now due on or before October 23, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/28/19. (MMW)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond by Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc.. (Karlson, Daisy)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Defendant United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The responsive pleading is now due on or before October 1, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/16/19. (MMW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Union of Plumbers, Fitters, Welders and Service Technicians. (Brown, W)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald King. Day & Zimmerman, NPS, Inc., served on 7/29/2019, Answer due 8/19/2019. (Calamusa, Rocco) Modified on 8/8/2019 (JLC).
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc.. Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc. waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Bedsole, Jenna)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Day & Zimmerman, Inc.. Day & Zimmerman, Inc. waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Bedsole, Jenna)
July 17, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601099180. (JLC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc., UA Local 91, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Union of Plumbers, Fitters, Welders and Service Technicians, United Association of Plumbers, Steamfitters, Welders and HVAC Technicians, returned to Plaintiffs for service on this the 17th day of July, 2019. (JLC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc., Day & Zimmerman, Inc., UA Local 91, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Union of Plumbers, Fitters, Welders and Service Technicians, United Association of Plumbers, Steamfitters, Welders and HVAC Technicians, filed by Anthony Robinson, Chris Samuel, Brian Struggs, Ronald King, Nolan Jones, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. UA Local 91 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Represented By: Russell W Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Samuel
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Represented By: Russell W Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Robinson
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Represented By: Russell W Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Struggs
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Represented By: Russell W Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald King
Represented By: Ann K Wiggins
Represented By: Russell W Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Union of Plumbers, Fitters, Welders and Service Technicians
Represented By: W Tucker Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UA Local 91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day & Zimmerman, Inc.
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day & Zimmerman NPS, Inc.
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Association of Plumbers, Steamfitters, Welders and HVAC Technicians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?