Mayton v. Scott Electric Sign Company Inc

Plaintiff: Glen Mayton
Defendant: Scott Electric Sign Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01128
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/30/2019. (KAM)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Porter, Adam)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/16/2019. (JLC)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Scott Electric Sign Company Inc.(Keller, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clois Keller on behalf of Scott Electric Sign Company Inc (Keller, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Mayton. Scott Electric Sign Company Inc served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (KAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Scott Electric Sign Company Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 25th day of July, 2019. (JLC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Glen Mayton. (Porter, Adam)
July 22, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3394785, NDAL receipt #B4601099278. (Porter, Adam) Modified on 7/22/2019 (JLC).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Electric Sign Company Inc, filed by Glen Mayton.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayton v. Scott Electric Sign Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Mayton
Represented By: Adam M Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Electric Sign Company Inc
Represented By: Robert Clois Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?