Perley v. Marriott International Inc
Plaintiff: Natasha D Perley
Defendant: Marriott International Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01145
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/26/2019. (JLC)
August 23, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3418569, NDAL receipt #B4601100097. (AFS). (Niemeyer, Michael) Modified on 8/23/2019 (JLC).
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International Inc. filed by Marriott International Inc (Niemeyer, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge R David Proctor. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-01145-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. The telephone conference set on Friday, 8/23/2019 is CANCELLED. (AFS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Natasha D Perley re #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (English, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Niemeyer, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER The telephone conference set for 8/21 at 10:00 a.m. is RESET for Friday, August 23, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017; access code 4577302 five minutes prior to the start of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/20/2019. (AVC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Natasha D Perley (English, Mark)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/23/2019. (AFS)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/5/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/5/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 8/21/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/23/2019. (AFS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Marriott International Inc.(Niemeyer, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marriott International Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2019-902698.00., filed by Marriott International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perley v. Marriott International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha D Perley
Represented By: Mark Allen English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Inc
Represented By: Michael C Niemeyer
Represented By: Christine Harding Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?