Davis v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Ralph Davis, Jr
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01148
Filed: July 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed BNSF Railway Company served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 22, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3395188 (B4601099308). related document #1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company, filed by Ralph Davis, Jr.(MRR, ). (Rice, Richard) Modified on 7/23/2019 (MRR, ).
July 22, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Ralph Davis, Jr. (MRR, )
July 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company, filed by Ralph Davis, Jr.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Davis, Jr
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?