Hauser v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Plaintiff: William Hauser
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, Hyundai Mobis Co Ltd, Hyundai Motor Group, TRW Automotive Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, TRW Automotive US LLC, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp and Hyundai Motor America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01194
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of California Central for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically submitted to Clerk of Court in District of California Central. (KEK)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Hauser. TRW Automotive Inc served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; TRW Automotive US LLC served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; ZF Friedrichshafen AG served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (KAM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor America Inc, TRW Automotive Inc, TRW Automotive US LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp. mailed certified mail (KAM)
July 31, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3401990, NDAL receipt #B4601099507. (Tapley, Frank) Modified on 8/1/2019 (JLC).
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by William Hauser. (KAM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Mobis Co Ltd, Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor Group, TRW Automotive Inc, TRW Automotive US LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp, filed by William Hauser.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauser v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Mobis Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hauser
Represented By: Jonathan S Mann
Represented By: Hirlye Ray Lutz, III
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Lauren Sanderson Miller
Represented By: Christopher T Hellums
Represented By: Adam W Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?