Evans v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Linda Evans
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2019cv01237
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 8/15/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (BJL)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk for service by USMS. (BJL)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/8/19. (BJL)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/2/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Linda Evans. (BJL)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Linda Evans.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Evans
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?