Hoover City of v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Plaintiff: Hoover City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo International PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Allergen PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma L P, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Specgx LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Jassen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC and Actavis Pharma Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01256
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Mallinckrodt PLC. (MRR, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2804: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL;record electronically sent to Clerk of Court the Northern District of Ohio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/22/19. (MRR, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted (green card detached) as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. (MRR, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Actavis LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Endo International PLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Noramco Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (MRR, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Cardinal Health Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Par Pharmaceutical Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Specgx LLC served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (MRR, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted (green card detached) as to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (MRR, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hoover City of. Allergen PLC served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Johnson & Johnson served (no date on green card); Ortho-Mcneil-Jassen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Purdue Pharma Inc (no date on green card); Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019; The Purdue Frederick Company Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Watson Laboratories Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (KEK)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Endo Pharmaceuticals served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed McKesson Corporation served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Purdue Pharma L P served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Actavis Pharma Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cephalon Inc served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (MRR, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergen PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-Mcneil-Jassen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 7, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3407329 (B4601099697). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hoover City of.(AFS). (West, Kimberly) Modified on 8/8/2019 (MRR, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail. (AFS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hoover City of.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover City of v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergen PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Jassen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoover City of
Represented By: Mark Montgomery Hogewood
Represented By: Phillip D Corley, Jr
Represented By: Kimberly R West
Represented By: Roderick J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?