Western Surety Company v. Delisa M Hurst
Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Defendant: Delisa M Hurst
Case Number: 2:2019cv01273
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Delisa M Hurst (MRR, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Supplemental MOTION for Entry of Default Motion is RIPE 10/3/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian A. Dodd)(Dodd, Brian)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default Motion is RIPE 10/2/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian A. Dodd)(Dodd, Brian)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Delisa M. Hurst Motion is RIPE 9/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nancy A. Leibel)(Dodd, Brian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Delisa Hurst on 9/3/19 with Answer due 09/24/2019 by Western Surety Company. (Dodd, Brian) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (MRR, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Surety Company. filed by Western Surety Company (Dodd, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Delisa M Hurst., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
August 9, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3408538 (B4601099771). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Delisa M Hurst, filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MRR, ). (Dodd, Brian) Modified on 8/12/2019 (MRR, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delisa M Hurst, filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Surety Company v. Delisa M Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Brian A Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delisa M Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?