Pelkey v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Todd Pelkey
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc and Keith Sweeny
Case Number: 2:2019cv01284
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 49:20109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/20/2019. (KSS)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL; A Pretrial Conference is hereby set for March 25, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. A Jury Trial is also set for May 3, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. in Birmingham, Alabama, at the Hugo L. Black, U. S. Federal Courthouse before Judge Abdul K Kallon. It is further ORDERED that the parties submit a Report of Parties' Planning Meeting as required by FRCP 26(f) in accordance with this Trial date by November 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/20/2019. (JLC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Crawford S McGivaren, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (McGivaren, Crawford)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Keith Sweeny. filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Keith Sweeny (McGivaren, Crawford)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Keith Sweeny.(Graham, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Keith Sweeny served (no date on green card). (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Keith Sweeny mailed certified mail. (AFS)
August 12, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3409932 (ALND B4601099828). (Tucker, William) Modified on 8/21/2019 (AFS).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Todd Pelkey. (AFS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Keith Sweeny, filed by Todd Pelkey.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelkey v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Sweeny
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Pelkey
Represented By: William C Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?