Beaulieu v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Donna J Beaulieu
Defendant: William Barr and US Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2019cv01294
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna J Beaulieu. US Department of Justice served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Beaulieu, Donna)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna J Beaulieu. William Barr served on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/16/2019. (Beaulieu, Donna)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Barr, US Department of Justice given back to plaintiff for service. (AFS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donna J Beaulieu.(Beaulieu, Donna)
August 16, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601099924 (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, US Department of Justice, filed by Donna J Beaulieu.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaulieu v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J Beaulieu
Represented By: Donna J Beaulieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?