Mid-Atlantic Bulk Carriers LTD v. Z-Dust Group Inc
Plaintiff: Mid-Atlantic Bulk Carriers LTD
Defendant: Z-Dust Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01296
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 25, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 25, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on November 13, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/10/19. (MRR, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Response Petition to Enforce Foreign Arbitratal Award by Z-Dust Group Inc.(Smitherman, Christopher)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Z-Dust Group, Inc. on 9/23/19, filed by Mid-Atlantic Bulk Carriers LTD. (Sansbury, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to Z-Dust Group Inc., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Z-Dust Group Inc. (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Z-Dust Group Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601099871 (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Mid-Atlantic Bulk Carriers LTD. (Sansbury, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Z-Dust Group Inc, filed by Mid-Atlantic Bulk Carriers LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-Atlantic Bulk Carriers LTD v. Z-Dust Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Dust Group Inc
Represented By: Christopher R Smitherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Atlantic Bulk Carriers LTD
Represented By: Michael Sansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?