Goudy Construction Inc v. Raks Fire Sprinkler LLC et al
Plaintiff: Goudy Construction Inc
Defendant: Romero Ali, Raks Fire Sprinkler LLC and AEGIS Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01303
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER his matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default #23 , filed October 7, 2019. Defendants Romero Ali and Raks Sprinkler filed Answers #24 #25 responding to Plaintiffs Complaint #1 on October 8, 2019. Because the Complaint #1 has been answered, Plaintiff's Motion #23 is MOOT. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE Plaintiff's Motion #23 . The court reminds counsel that (1) communication is not just advisable but required and (2) Rule 55 is not a "gotcha rule. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/9/2019. (KAM)
October 8, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Raks Fire Sprinkler LLC.(Keenan, George)
October 8, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Romero Ali.(Keenan, George)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Entry ofDefault as to Defendants Raks Fire Sprinkler, LLC and Romero Ali by Goudy Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Service - Romero Ali, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service - Raks Fire Sprinkler, LLC, #3 Exhibit Romero Ali - Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Summons and Notice of Removal Raks Fire Sprinkler & Romero Ali)(Rice, Richard) Modified on 10/8/2019 (KAM, ).
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to re 21 , #16 In Opposition to Aegis' Motion to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiff's Bad Faith Claim filed by Goudy Construction Inc. (Rice, Richard)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on two pending motions #18 #19 . First, Defendant AEGIS Security Insurance Company filed a Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response #18 . Second, Plaintiff Goudy Construction Company filed a Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply #19 . After careful consideration, Defendant AEGIS's Motion #18 is DENIED and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED #19 . Plaintiff SHALL file the sur-reply on or before October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/4/2019. (KAM)
September 28, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rice, Richard)
September 21, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Strike #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, or In the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Goudy Construction Inc. (Rice, Richard)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, by AEGIS Security Insurance Company. (Keenan, George)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim Supplement filed by Goudy Construction Inc. (Rice, Richard)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant AEGIS Security Insurance Company re: #4 MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim filed by AEGIS Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Keenan, George)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim filed by Goudy Construction Inc. (Rice, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted (not deliverable as addressed) by Goudy Construction Inc as to Raks Fire Sprinkler LLC. (KEK)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER - This case is before the court on Defendant AEGIS Security Insurance Company's Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim #4 . The parties are REMINDED to brief the motion in accordance with Exhibit B to the court's Initial Order #12 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/28/2019. (KEK)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/28/2019. (KAM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to re #4 Notice of Filing Exhibts in Support filed by AEGIS Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Keenan, George)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge R David Proctor. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1303-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. The telephone status conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:45 a.m. is CANCELLED. (AFS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Romero Ali served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (AFS)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/21/2019. (AFS)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 10/4/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 10/4/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:45 a.m. on 9/20/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/21/2019. (AFS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by AEGIS Security Insurance Company.(Keenan, George)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #4 MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim filed by AEGIS Security Insurance Company. Plaintiff's response is due by September 3, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by September 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/20/2019. (CDG)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss the Bad Faith Claim by AEGIS Security Insurance Company. (Keenan, George)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Romero Ali, Raks Fire Sprinkler LLC mailed certified mail. (AFS)
August 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601099875 (AFS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AEGIS Security Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv2019-900586.00., filed by AEGIS Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Consent to Removal)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goudy Construction Inc v. Raks Fire Sprinkler LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goudy Construction Inc
Represented By: Vicki Bradley-Seals
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero Ali
Represented By: George Matthew Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raks Fire Sprinkler LLC
Represented By: George Matthew Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS Security Insurance Company
Represented By: George Matthew Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?