Arrington v. HOVG LLC
Plaintiff: Skylar Arrington
Defendant: HOVG LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01309
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- Pltf has informed the court that the parties have agreed to a settlement of her claims in this lawsuit (Doc #6 ); Accordingly, it is ORDERED that on or before October 24, 2019, Pltf shall file a stipulation of dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and the Local Rules of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/24/19. (MRR, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to re #5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER (DOC. 5) AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Skylar Arrington. (Seals, W)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- It is ORDERED that, on or before September 30, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any exists, as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute her claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/23/19. (MRR, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed HOVG LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (MRR, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HOVG LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412311 (B4601099881). related document #1 COMPLAINT against HOVG LLC, filed by Skylar Arrington.(MRR, ). (Seals, W) Modified on 8/15/2019 (MRR, ).
August 14, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Skylar Arrington. (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOVG LLC, filed by Skylar Arrington.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. HOVG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOVG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar Arrington
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?