Lloyd v. Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cretest Theodore Lloyd
Defendant: M & T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and Movement Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01312
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/2/2019. (JLC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Cretest Theodore Lloyd III by Cretest Theodore Lloyd. filed by Cretest Theodore Lloyd (Lay, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The Plaintiff's amended complaint is due 9/17/2019. No further extensions will be given. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/16/2019. (AFS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time For Filing Amended Complaint by Cretest Theodore Lloyd. (Lay, Kenneth)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying #6 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/30/2019. (AFS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, M & T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Movement Mortgage LLC. (Friedman, Rachel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, M & T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Movement Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B- Note)(Friedman, Rachel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by M & T Bank. filed by M & T Bank (Mitchell, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Friedman, Rachel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Friedman, Rachel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Movement Mortgage LLC. filed by Movement Mortgage LLC (Friedman, Rachel)
August 15, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3413204 (ALND B4601099912) (Friedman, Rachel) Modified on 8/19/2019 (AFS).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Movement Mortgage LLC, M & T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc from Circuit Court Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900717.00., filed by Movement Mortgage LLC, M & T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & T Bank
Represented By: Matthew T Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Matthew T Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Matthew T Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movement Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Matthew T Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cretest Theodore Lloyd
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?