Larry et al v. Eagle View Apartments LLC
Plaintiff: Shiela Sanks, Cassandra Allen, Danny Larry, Dominic Love, Betty Goodman and James Escott
Defendant: Eagle View Apartments LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01321
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Eagle View has informed the Court that complete diversity of citizenship does not exist because there is a 5% ownership interest in the LLC by an Alabama citizen. (Doc. #7 ). Accordingly, the Court remands this action to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/13/2019. (KEK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO WITHDRAW REMOVAL by Eagle View Apartments LLC. (Turner, Kile) Modified docket text only on 9/13/2019 (KEK).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - This case is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the docket. Consistent with that review, the Court has determined that the jurisdictional allegations still need clarification. Eagle View must cure the deficient jurisdictional allegations before the Court may determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1653 (Defective allegations of jurisdiction may be amended, upon terms, in the trial or appellate courts.). Consequently, within seven days, Eagle View shall please file an amended notice of removal that sufficiently indicates the citizenship of Eagle View Multi-Family Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/6/2019. (KEK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to a district judge randomly drawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/3/2019. (KAM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Amended Notice of Removal) by Eagle View Apartments LLC. filed by Eagle View Apartments LLC (Turner, Kile) Modified on 9/3/2019 (KAM).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Defendant is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, why this action is not due to be Remanded to State Court for want of jurisdiction. In the alternative, Defendant may satisfy its obligation by filing an Amended Notice of Removal that sufficiently establishes the citizenship of all parties. Such Response SHALL be filed by August 30, 2019. Defendants are advised that failure to comply with this Order shall result in the Remand of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/16/2019. (JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3413407, NDAL receipt #B4601099915. (Turner, Kile) Modified on 8/16/2019 (JLC).
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eagle View Apartments LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2019-903088. (), filed by Eagle View Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry et al v. Eagle View Apartments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiela Sanks
Represented By: John Seymour Somerset
Represented By: Richard A Storm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Allen
Represented By: John Seymour Somerset
Represented By: Richard A Storm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Larry
Represented By: John Seymour Somerset
Represented By: Richard A Storm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Love
Represented By: John Seymour Somerset
Represented By: Richard A Storm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Goodman
Represented By: John Seymour Somerset
Represented By: Richard A Storm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Escott
Represented By: John Seymour Somerset
Represented By: Richard A Storm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle View Apartments LLC
Represented By: Kile T Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?